EP2036048 - METHOD OF APPROXIMATING POLYGONS AND POLYHEDRA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newscape Technology Rue Paul Sabatier 22300 Lannion / FR | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Newscape Technology 4 Rue Ampère B.P 30255 22300 Lannion / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REY, Alain 78 rue de la Tombe-Issoire 75014 Paris / FR | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07765769.0 | 03.07.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP56661 | Priority number, date | FR20060052812 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0652812 | [2009/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008003687 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036048 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/20, G06T17/20 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
G06T11/203 (EP);
G06T17/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM APPROXIMIEREN VON POLYGONEN UND POLYHEDERN | [2009/12] | English: | METHOD OF APPROXIMATING POLYGONS AND POLYHEDRA | [2009/12] | French: | PROCEDE D ' APPROXIMATION DES POLYGONES ET DES POLYEDRES | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006027470 (REY ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 6 - page 14, line 27 * * figures 4a-4g * | [X] - KU K -M ET AL, "Polygonal approximation of digital curve by graduate iterative merging", ELECTRONICS LETTERS UK, (19950316), vol. 31, no. 6, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 444 - 446, XP002418610 [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19950319 | [A] - LONGIN JAN LATECKI ET AL, "Extraction of key frames from videos by polygon simplification", SIGNAL PROCESSING AND ITS APPICATIONS, SIXTH INTERNATIONAL, SYMPOSIUM ON. 2001 AUG. 16-16, 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010816), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-6703-0, pages 643 - 646, XP010557133 [A] 1-10 * section 3 * * figure 1 * | [A] - SAYKOL E ET AL, "KiMPA: a kinematics-based method for polygon approximation", ADVANCES IN INFORMATION SYSTEMS. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, ADVIS 2002. PROCEEDINGS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOL.2457) SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (2002), ISBN 3-540-00009-7, pages 186 - 194, XP002418611 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * sections 1, 2.2, 3, 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-36077-8_18 | [A] - DOUGLAS D H ET AL, "ALGORITHMS FOR THE REDUCTION OF THE NUMBER OF POINTS REQUIRED TO REPRESENT A DIGITIZED LINE OR ITS CARICATURE", CANADIAN CARTOGRAPHER, YORK UNIVERSITY, DOWNSVIEW, CA, (1973), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0008-3127, pages 112 - 122, XP009005710 [A] 1 * page 115 - page 117 * * figure 2 * | by applicant | - KU K-M, POLYGONAL APPROXIMATION OF DIGITAL CURVE BY GRADUATE ITERATIVE MERGING |