EP2027379 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING A FLOW OF RECIRCULATING GAS FLOWING THROUGH AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE RECIRCULATION LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alfonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEISBARDT, Olivier 15, Impasse des Touaines 91470 Forge Les Bains / FR | 02 /
TAVERNIER, Guillaume 5, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux 77600 Bussy St Georges / FR | 03 /
MICHEL, Alexandre 5, Avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2009/09] | Application number, filing date | 07766119.7 | 30.05.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007FR51352 | Priority number, date | FR20060005177 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0605177 | [2009/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144528 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027379 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D21/08, F02M25/07 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
F02M26/25 (EP);
F02B29/0418 (EP);
F02D21/08 (EP);
F02M26/05 (EP);
F02M26/16 (EP);
F02M26/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLUSSREGELUNG DES DURCH DIE UMWÄLZLEITUNG EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS FLIESSENDEN UMWÄLZGASES | [2009/09] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REGULATING A FLOW OF RECIRCULATING GAS FLOWING THROUGH AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE RECIRCULATION LINE | [2009/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION D'UN FLUX DE GAZ DE RECIRCULATION CIRCULANT DANS UNE LIGNE DE RECIRCULATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 08.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 12.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0489263 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 6; figure - * * column 11, lines 18-26 - column 13, lines 25-34 * * column 14, lines 29-34 *; | [A]US5732688 (CHARLTON STEVE J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,6 * column 3, lines 26-42 - column 4, lines 17-24; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9630635 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 4, lines 12-25; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003114978 (RIMNAC ET AL.) [A] 1,6 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] - [0027]; figure - * |