EP2040815 - COATING PROCESS AND COATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Robert Gordon University Schoolhill Aberdeen, AB10 1FR / GB | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADLEY, Robert, Harold The Robert Gordon University Schoolhill Aberdeen AB10 1FR / GB | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Ramsay, Laura Anne, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Ramsay, Laura Anne, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Ede, Eric Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Ede, Eric Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07766250.0 | 16.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007GB02679 | Priority number, date | GB20060014081 | 17.07.2006 Original published format: GB 0614081 | GB20060014475 | 21.07.2006 Original published format: GB 0614475 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008009911 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040815 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C09C1/3063 (EP,US);
B01D39/2055 (EP,US);
B01D39/2065 (EP,US);
C09C1/56 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0407 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0421 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0428 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0478 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0613 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0618 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0654 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1291 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND BESCHICHTETES PRODUKT | [2009/14] | English: | COATING PROCESS AND COATED PRODUCT | [2009/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT ET PRODUIT AINSI REVÊTU | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4882225 (FUKUI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-24,41,43-55 * column 7, line 4 - line 19 * * column 11, line 18 - line 25 * * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 68 * * column 34, line 24 - line 36; examples 9-1; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US2005095189 (BREY LARRY A [US], et al) [X] 1-24,41,43-55 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0049] - [0060] - [0121] , [0122] , [0131] , [0142] , [0144]; claims 26,34,36 * |