EP2052506 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yuefeng 20 Barnmead Haywards Heath West Sussex RH16 1UZ / GB | 02 /
HART, Michael, John, Beems 136 Cobbold Road London W12 9LL / GB | 03 /
VADGAMA, Sunil, Keshavji 24 Ashview Gardens Ashford Middlesex TW15 3RD / GB | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07766388.8 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007GB02888 | Priority number, date | GB20060016478 | 18.08.2006 Original published format: GB 0616478 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020163 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052506 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H04L45/123 (EP,CN,US);
H04W40/12 (KR);
H04W40/22 (EP,CN,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L45/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/37] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2009/18] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2009/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATION | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6034946 (ROGINSKY ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 1, line 23 - line 32 * * column 5, line 18 - line 32 * * claim 3 * [A] 24; | [XA]EP1617608 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-23 * claims 1-10 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0011] - [0022] * [A] 24; | [A] - ROYER E M ET AL, "A review of current routing protocols for ad hoc mobile wireless networks", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, US, (199904), ISSN 1070-9916, pages 46 - 55, XP002283423 [A] 1-24 * page 46, column R, line 18 - page 48, column L, line 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.760423 |