EP2032280 - DEVICE FOR CRUSHING THE ENDS OF TUBULAR SECTIONS, IN PARTICULAR OF VEHICULAR BUMPERS, AND RELATED METHOD FOR PROVIDING SAID CRUSHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CO Proget S.R.L. Via Reano 6-8 10040 Rivalta di Torino / IT | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACCOSSATO, Angelo Via Ragusa 15 I-10137 Torino / IT | 02 /
ACCOSSATO, Claudio Via Canonica 11/F I-10137 Torino / IT | 03 /
PIEROBON, Andrea Via Canonica 11/G I-10137 Torino / IT | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Camolese, Marco, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Camolese, Marco, et al Metroconsult S.r.L. Via Sestriere 100 I-10060 None (TO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 07766532.1 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007IB01560 | Priority number, date | IT2006TO00421 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: IT TO20060421 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007144739 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032280 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/88, B21D5/06 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B21D53/88 (EP);
B21D41/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUSAMMENQUETSCHEN DER ENDEN VON RÖHRENFÖRMIGEN PROFILEN, INSBESONDERE FAHRZEUGSTOSSDÄMPFERN, UND VERWANDTES VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG DES ZUSAMMENQUETSCHENS | [2009/11] | English: | DEVICE FOR CRUSHING THE ENDS OF TUBULAR SECTIONS, IN PARTICULAR OF VEHICULAR BUMPERS, AND RELATED METHOD FOR PROVIDING SAID CRUSHING | [2009/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT L'ÉCRASEMENT DES EXTRÉMITÉS DE PROFILÉS TUBULAIRES, EN PARTICULIER DE PARE-CHOCS DE VÉHICULES, ET PROCÉDÉ CONNEXE DE MISE EN UVRE DUDIT ÉCRASEMENT | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001063307 (TUBE FOMING CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2000335333 (FUTABA IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2,8 * figures 10-12 *; | [AD]US5577796 (CLAUSEN EDVIN L [DK]) [AD] 1,8 * figures 1-3 * |