EP2042628 - WOVEN FABRIC FOR AIR BAGS, AIR BAGS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE WOVEN FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIYAMA, Tomomichi c/o Osaka Head Office Toray Industries, Inc. 3-3, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8222 / JP | 02 /
YAHATA, Daisuke c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | 03 /
YOKOI, Daisuke c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | [2013/40] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
FUJIYAMA, Tomomichi c/o Osaka Head Office Toray Industries, Inc. 3-3, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8222 / JP | ||
02 /
YAHATA, Daisuke c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | |||
03 /
YOKOI, Daisuke c/o Seta Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-2141 / JP | Representative(s) | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Webster, Jeremy Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07767422.4 | 22.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007JP62613 | Priority number, date | JP20060173538 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006173538 | [2009/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007148791 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042628 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2042628 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/235, D03D13/00, D03D15/00, D03D1/02 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B60R21/235 (EP,US);
D03D1/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
D03D13/00 (KR);
D03D13/008 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,KR,US);
D03D15/46 (EP,US);
D03D15/573 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23509 (EP,US);
D10B2201/24 (EP,US);
D10B2321/021 (EP,US);
D10B2331/02 (EP,US);
D10B2331/021 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
D10B2505/124 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | D03D1/02, B60R21/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBE FÜR LUFTSÄCKE, LUFTSÄCKE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GEWEBES | [2009/14] | English: | WOVEN FABRIC FOR AIR BAGS, AIR BAGS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF THE WOVEN FABRIC | [2009/14] | French: | MATÉRIAU TEXTILE POUR COUSSINS GONFLABLES, COUSSINS GONFLABLES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CE MATÉRIAU TEXTILE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2009 | Translation filed | 14.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 14.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.06.2007 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | IE | 22.06.2014 | LU | 22.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.06.2007 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 22.06.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 22.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003008582 (KOKETSU TOMOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]JP2004217203 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005105446 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [I]JP2005281933 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [I] 1-9 * Abstarct; paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0015] , [0016] , [0017] , [0022] , [0023] , [0027] - [0032] - [0041] * | International search | [A]JPH03176250 (TAKATA CORP); | [A]WO9420334 (TEIJIN LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JPH082359 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JP2005281933 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2006016707 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [AP]JP2006256474 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [AP]JP2006291396 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [AE]JP2007224486 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPH03137245 | JP2000303303 | JP2001200447 | JP2006016707 |