EP2036456 - SHELF DEVICE AND INCUBATOR PROVIDED WITH IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Healthcare Co., Ltd. 2131-1, Minamigata Toon-shi Ehime 791-0395 / JP | [2012/50] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 5-5 Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSAWA, Shinji 393, 10gaiku, Furukori Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0536 / JP | 02 /
BUSUJIMA, Hiroki 177-2, Higashiimaizumicho Ota-shi Gunma 373-0021 / JP | [2014/36] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
OSAWA, Shinji 393, 10gaiku, Furukori Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma 370-0536 / JP | ||
02 /
BUSUJIMA, Hiroki 177-2, Higashiimaizumicho Ota-shi Gunma 373-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/36] |
Former [2009/12] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07768043.7 | 03.07.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007JP63269 | Priority number, date | JP20060185265 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006185265 | [2009/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008004533 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036456 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036456 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47B57/40, C12M1/00, C12M1/36, C12M3/00, A47B88/04 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
C12M41/14 (EP,US);
A47B57/40 (EP,KR,US);
A47B57/32 (KR);
A47B88/43 (EP,US);
C12M1/36 (KR);
C12M23/48 (EP,US);
C12M3/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | A47B57/40, A47B57/32, A47F5/00, C12M1/00, C12M1/36, C12M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | 06.01.2009 | BA | 06.01.2009 | HR | 06.01.2009 | MK | 06.01.2009 | RS | 06.01.2009 | Title | German: | REGALVORRICHTUNG UND DAMIT VERSEHENER BRUTSCHRANK | [2009/12] | English: | SHELF DEVICE AND INCUBATOR PROVIDED WITH IT | [2009/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉTAGÈRE ET INCUBATEUR MUNI DE CELUI-CI | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2009 | Translation filed | 06.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2007 | AT | 03.09.2014 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4681381 (SEVEY DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-4* column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US5470143 (GILL JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 28; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2005084420 (OSAWA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]JPH0325599Y ; | [A]JPH0427844Y ; | [A]JP2000166536 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2003275068 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | Examination | US5895020 | by applicant | US5895020 | JP2000166536 |