EP2044831 - PLANTING BASE, PLANT-BEARING MASS, PLANTING BASE UNIT, PLANTING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PLANTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Kunio c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Albutt, Anthony John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Albutt, Anthony John, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07768391.0 | 05.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007JP63867 | Priority number, date | JP20060194851 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006194851 | [2009/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008007722 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044831 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01G1/00, A01G25/06, A01G27/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A01G20/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [2009/33] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZBASIS, PFLANZENLAGERMASSE, PFLANZBASISEINHEIT, PFLANZSYSTEM UND PFLANZVERFAHREN | [2009/15] | English: | PLANTING BASE, PLANT-BEARING MASS, PLANTING BASE UNIT, PLANTING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF PLANTING | [2009/15] | French: | BÂTI DE PLANTATION, VOLUME DE SUPPORT DE PLANTE, UNITÉ DE BÂTI DE PLANTATION, SYSTÈME DE PLANTATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLANTATION | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2009 | Translation filed | 11.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 17.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2005348669 (GUROOBEN KK) [X] 2 * abstract * [Y] 1,3-8; | [Y]WO9604780 (GRAIN SECURITY FOUNDATION LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1,3-8 * page 2, line 3 - page 4, line 15; figure - *; | [A]JP2002291339 (KONOIKE CONST, et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]FR2851419 (PRM [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 6 - line 34; figure -; claim 1 * | International search | [X]JP2000328574 (SUGIYAMA CONSTRUCTION); | [Y]JPS57152826 (YAMASHITA MUNETOMI); | [Y]JPS6328333 (NAKAMURA KEIKO); | [Y]JP2004298140 (OKUMURA CORP); | [Y]JPS52107933 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JPH06303860 (SUZUKI TSUGUO); | [Y]JP2001169672 (MIKADO IKUSHU NOJO KK) | by applicant | JPH0787857 | JPH10504192 |