EP2042997 - INFORMATION COMMUNICATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, INFORMATION COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, FUNCTION SWITCHING METHOD, AND FUNCTION SWITCHING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Hiroaki NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
EDAHIRO, Masato NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07768463.7 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007JP64534 | Priority number, date | JP20060195192 | 18.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006195192 | [2009/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008010598 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042997 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F9/445, G06F9/46, G06F9/54, H04M11/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/36] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT, INFORMATIONSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, FUNKTIONSUMSCHALTVERFAHREN UND FUNKTIONSUMSCHALTPROGRAMM | [2009/14] | English: | INFORMATION COMMUNICATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION COMMUNICATION TERMINAL, INFORMATION COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, FUNCTION SWITCHING METHOD, AND FUNCTION SWITCHING PROGRAM | [2009/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS, TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUTATION DE FONCTION, ET PROGRAMME DE COMMMUTATION DE FONCTION | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | Translation filed | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 19.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004088710 (RONKKA RISTO [FI], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [Y]US5212792 (GERETY M COLIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 8, line 34 - line 64 * | International search | [Y]JP2002287985 (SIROYAN LTD); | [Y]JP2006074477 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [Y]JP2006155285 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [Y]JP2005099960 (BROTHER IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2005348233 | JP2003229950 | JP2004500666 | JP2522162B | JP2006195192 |