EP2038425 - HIGH THROUGHPUT PHYSICAL MAPPING USING AFLP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEYGENE N.V. P.O. Box 216 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN EIJK, Michael, Josephus, Theresia Pastoor Strijboschstraat 12 NL-5373 EJ Herpen / NL | 02 /
JESSE, Taco, Peter Thorbeckestraat 372 NL-6702 CG Wageningen / NL | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | de Lang, Robbert-Jan Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | de Lang, Robbert-Jan P.O. Box 3241 2280GE Rijswijk ZH / NL | Application number, filing date | 07768906.5 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007NL00177 | Priority number, date | US20060830121P | 12.07.2006 Original published format: US 830121 P | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008007951 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2038425 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2038425 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2535/138 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENOMISCHE KARTIERUNG MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ UNTER VERWENDUNG VON AFLP | [2009/41] | English: | HIGH THROUGHPUT PHYSICAL MAPPING USING AFLP | [2009/13] | French: | CARTOGRAPHIE PHYSIQUE À HAUT DÉBIT PAR AFLP | [2009/13] |
Former [2009/13] | PHYSIKALISCHE KARTIERUNG MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ UNTER VERWENDUNG VON AFLP | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 22.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP10153477.4 / EP2182079 | EP10176619.4 / EP2275576 | EP14183919.1 / EP2821506 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004063323 (KEYGENE NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-11 * example 1 *; | [PA]WO2006137734 (KEYGENE NV [NL], et al) [PA] 1-11* figure 1; claims 1,14 *; | [ADX] - KLEIN P E ET AL, "A high-throughput AFLP-based method for constructing integrated genetic and physical maps: Progress toward a sorghum genome map", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (200006), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 789 - 807, XP002240094 [AD] 1-11 [X] 12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.10.6.789 | [A] - BOUZIDI MOHAMED FOUAD ET AL, "A sunflower BAC library suitable for PCR screening and physical mapping of targeted genomic regions.", TAG. THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS. THEORETISCHE UND ANGEWANDTE GENETIK JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 113, no. 1, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 81 - 89, XP002456289 [A] 1-11 * page 82, column R, paragraph L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-006-0274-6 | [A] - XIA ZHENGJUN ET AL, "Construction and characterization of a BAC library of soybean", EUPHYTICA, (2005), vol. 141, no. 1-2, ISSN 0014-2336, pages 129 - 137, XP002456290 [A] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10681-005-6380-8 | [A] - JAMSARI A ET AL, "BAC-derived diagnostic markers for sex determination in asparagus", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (200404), vol. 108, no. 6, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 1140 - 1146, XP002456291 [A] 1-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00122-003-1529-0 |