EP2041946 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNICATION BETWEEN AN OBJECT, A USER DEVICE AND A SERVICE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telenor ASA Snarøyveien 30 1331 Fornebu / NO | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUGLI, Hans-Christian P. T. Mallings vei 40 A N-0286 Oslo / NO | 02 /
MELBY, Elin Fagertunveien 54B N-1357 Bekkestua / NO | 03 /
NOLL, Josef Linjeveien 6 N-1084 Oslo / NO | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
HAUGLI, Hans-Christian P. T. Mallings vei 40 A N-0286 Oslo / NO | ||
02 /
MELBY, Elin Nadderudveien 2 E N-1357 Bekkestua / NO | |||
03 /
NOLL, Josef Linjeveien 6 N-1084 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Onsagers Ltd c/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07768931.3 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007NO00208 | Priority number, date | NO20060003023 | 28.06.2006 Original published format: NO 20063023 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008002146 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041946 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041946 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L69/18 (EP,US);
Y04S40/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN EINEM OBJEKT, EINER BENUTZEREINRICHTUNG UND EINER SERVEREINRICHTUNG | [2009/14] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ESTABLISHING A COMMUNICATION BETWEEN AN OBJECT, A USER DEVICE AND A SERVICE DEVICE | [2009/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ÉTABLIR UNE COMMUNICATION ENTRE UN OBJET, UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR ET UN DISPOSITIF DE SERVICE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 12.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.2009 | BE | 28.10.2009 | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | IT | 28.10.2009 | LT | 28.10.2009 | LV | 28.10.2009 | MT | 28.10.2009 | NL | 28.10.2009 | PL | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | ES | 08.02.2010 | IS | 28.02.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | IE | 14.06.2010 | LU | 14.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
NL | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
LU | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
LU | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
MT | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 28.10.2009 | |
BE | 28.10.2009 | ||
CY | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 08.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004203352 (HALL ERIC S [US], et al) [A] 1,15,1,15,1,15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]WO2005029776 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,15,1,15,1,15 * page 2, line 15 - line L * * page 2, line 15 - line L * * page 2, line 15 - line L *; | [A]WO2006035315 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-28,1-28,1-28 * page 2, line 11 - line 17 * * page 2, line 27 - line L * * page 7, line 3 - line 18 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 6 * * page 2, line 11 - line 17 * * page 2, line 27 - line L * * page 7, line 3 - line 18 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 6 * * page 2, line 11 - line 17 * * page 2, line 27 - line L * * page 7, line 3 - line 18 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 6 *; | [Y]WO2006049742 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-28,1-28,1-28 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0062] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0062] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0062] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [PA]WO2006137740 (TELENOR ASA [NO], et al) [PA] 1-28,1-28,1-28 * the whole document * * the whole document ** the whole document *; | [Y] - GHANNAME, TAOUFIK, "How NFC can to speed Bluetooth transactions?today", (20060214), URL: http://www.wirelessnetdesignline.com/showArticle.jhtml?articleID=180203270, (20071108), XP002458023 [Y] 1-28,1-28,1-28 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * | [A] - YOSHIDA, JUNKO, "EE Times: Near-field comms makes a splash at 3GSM", (20060216), URL: http://www.eetimes.com/conf/3gsm/showArticle.jhtml?articleID=180203184&kc=6437, (20071108), XP002458024 [A] 1-28,1-28,1-28 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2006049742 |