EP2155014 - HARNESS FOR POWER TOOL HAVING A POLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLSSON, Daniel Gelbgjutargatan 13 S-553 23 Jönköping / SE | 02 /
ARVIDSSON, Gösta Långgatan 31 S-561 34 Huskvarna / SE | [2010/08] | Application number, filing date | 07768987.5 | 01.06.2007 | [2010/08] | WO2007SE00533 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008147259 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2155014 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/14, A01D34/90, A45F5/00, B25H1/00, A01G3/08, A01G3/053 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A45F3/14 (EP,US);
A01D34/902 (EP,US);
A01G3/053 (EP,US);
A01G3/085 (EP,US);
A45F5/004 (EP,US);
B25H1/0028 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | A45F3/14, A01D34/90, A45F5/00, B25H1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/08] | A45F3/14, A01D34/90 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/08] | Title | German: | GURTZEUG FÜR ELEKTROWERKZEUG MIT STANGE | [2010/08] | English: | HARNESS FOR POWER TOOL HAVING A POLE | [2010/08] | French: | HARNAIS POUR OUTIL À MOTEUR POURVU D'UN LONG MANCHE | [2010/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 22.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6247624 (RUNDBERG LEENA [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [YA]GB2028624 (CROOKS A B) [Y] 13 * page 2, lines 9-12 * [A] 11; | [XY]US3346955 (BENEKE HOWARD E) [X] 11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 13; | [I]US2005000994 (RUNDBERG LEENA [SE]) [I] 15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9409674 (PANTH PRODUKTER AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,15,16 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6247624 (RUNDBERG LEENA [SE]); | [Y]US4483070 (JUNKERMANN HOWARD C [US]); | [A]US2006179806 (MAIER GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]SE520705 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]); | [A]DE667986 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]GB2028624 (CROOKS A B) |