EP2019686 - COMBINED MUCOSAL AND PARENTERAL IMMUNIZATION AGAINST HIV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2012/28] |
Former [2009/06] | For all designated states NOVARTIS AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPPUOLI, Rino Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics Inc P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, David, J.M. Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | 03 /
BARNETT, Susan, W. Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | [2012/28] |
Former [2009/06] | 01 /
RAPPUOLI, Rino Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics Inc P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | ||
02 /
LEWIS, David, J.M. Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | |||
03 /
BARNETT, Susan, W. Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics Inc. P.O. Box 8097 Emeryville, CA 94662-8097 / US | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/06] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07773929.0 | 29.03.2007 | [2009/06] | WO2007US07583 | Priority number, date | US20060788563P | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 788563 P | US20060840178P | 26.08.2006 Original published format: US 840178 P | [2009/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007126825 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019686 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2019686 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/21 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
A61K39/21 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61K2039/543 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55544 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/06] | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE MUKOSALE UND PARENTERALE IMMUNISIERUNG GEGEN HIV | [2009/06] | English: | COMBINED MUCOSAL AND PARENTERAL IMMUNIZATION AGAINST HIV | [2009/06] | French: | IMMUNISATION MUCOSALE ET PARENTÉRALE COMBINÉE CONTRE LE VIH | [2009/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/06] | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2011 | 06.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11158008.0 / EP2382988 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2007 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | IE | 29.03.2013 | LU | 29.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO02080648 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [DA] * figure 1 *; | [X]US6511845 (DAVIS ALAN R [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * claim 6 *; | [DX]WO03059385 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [DX] 1-4 * page 3, line 9 - line 11; claim 1 *; | [X] - VAJDY MICHAEL ET AL, "Mucosal and systemic anti-HIV responses in rhesus macaques following combinations of intranasal and parenteral immunizations", AIDS RESEARCH AND HUMAN RETROVIRUSES, MARY ANN LIEBERT, US, (200411), vol. 20, no. 11, ISSN 0889-2229, pages 1269 - 1281, XP002422502 [X] 1-4,6-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/aid.2004.20.1269 | [X] - SRIVASTAVA INDRESH K ET AL, "Purification, characterization, and immunogenicity of a soluble trimeric envelope protein containing a partial deletion of the V2 loop derived from SF162, an R5-tropic human immunodeficiency virus type 1 isolate", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200310), vol. 77, no. 20, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 11244 - 11259, XP002332880 [X] 1-4,6-19 * figure 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.20.11244-11259.2003 | [A] - MCCLUSKIE MICHAEL J ET AL, "Parenteral and mucosal prime-boost immunization strategies in mice with hepatitis B surface antigen and CpG DNA", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020218), vol. 32, no. 3, ISSN 0928-8244, pages 179 - 185, XP002288583 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0928-8244(01)00305-4 | Examination | - LEWIS D ET AL, "Transient Facial Nerve Paralysis (Bell's Palsy) following Intranasal Delivery of a Genetically Detoxified Mutant of Escherichia coli Heat Labile Toxin", PLOS ONE, (200909), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:DOI:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0006999, ISSN 1932-6203 | by applicant | - IBBA, BIOTECHNOL. GENET. ENG. REV, (1996), vol. 13, pages 197 - 216 |