EP2008202 - NATURAL LANGUAGE WATERMARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corporation 32 Avenue of the Americas New York NY 10013-2412 / US | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 3000 Kent Avenue, B-101 West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2009/18] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states AT&T Corporation 32 Avenue of the Americas New York NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATALLAH, Mike 3400 Elkhart Street West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
BANGALORE, Srinivas 65 Old Glen Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 03 /
HAKKANI-TUR, Dilek Z. 20554 Crow Creek Road Castro Valey, CA 94552 / US | 04 /
RICCARDI, Giuseppe 929 Garden Street, Apt.1l Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | 05 /
TOPKARA, Mercan 2435 Kestral Blvd., Apt. D West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 06 /
TOPKARA, Umut 2435 Kestral Blvd., Apt. D West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07775502.3 | 13.04.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007US09280 | Priority number, date | US20060279835 | 14.04.2006 Original published format: US 279835 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007120889 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008202 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
G06F40/211 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/27] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERZEICHEN NATÜRLICHER SPRACHEN | [2009/01] | English: | NATURAL LANGUAGE WATERMARKING | [2009/01] | French: | FILIGRANAGE DE LANGAGE NATUREL | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 18.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 05.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - MERCAN TOPKARA, GIUSEPPE RICCARDI, DILEK HAKKANI-TÜR, MIKHAIL ATALLAH, "Natural language watermarking: challenges in building a practical system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SECURITY, STEGANOGRAPHY, AND WATERMARKING OF MULTIMEDIA CONTENTS VIII, (20060215), vol. 6072, XP002467639 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.643560 | [X] - YULING LIU ET AL, "A Natural Language Watermarking Based on Chinese Syntax", ADVANCES IN NATURAL COMPUTATION LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BE, (2005), vol. 3612, ISBN 3-540-28320-X, pages 958 - 961, XP019014419 [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 959, line 22 - page 961, line LAST * | [X] - ATALLAH AND AL., "Natural Language Watermarking: Design, Analysis, and a Proof-of-Concept Implementation", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, Springer Berlin / Heidelberg, (2001), vol. 2137, pages 185 - 200, XP002467640 [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 188, line 18 - page 193, line 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-45496-9_14 | [X] - XINGMING SUN, ALEX JESSEY ASIIMWE, "Noun-Verb Based Technique of Text Watermarking Using Recursive Decent Semantic Net", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, Springer Berlin / Heidelberg, (2005), vol. 3612, pages 968 - 971, XP002467641 [X] 1-22 * abstract * * page 969, line 19 - page 971, line LAST * | [A] - ATALLAH & AL., Natural Language Watermarking and Tamperproofing, 5TH INTERNATIONAL INFORMATION HIDING WORKSHOP, (2002), XP002467642 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 10 * |