EP2014084 - CMOS IMAGE SENSOR PIXEL USING A PHOTODIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OmniVision Technologies, Inc. 4275 Burton Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Weize 155 Crandon Way Rochester, New York 14618 / US | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/37] |
Former [2011/22] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/03] | Lee, Brenda Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07775689.8 | 18.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US09483 | Priority number, date | US20060416055 | 02.05.2006 Original published format: US 416055 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007133380 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014084 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014084 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/378, H04N5/353 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H04N25/53 (EP,KR,US);
H01L27/146 (KR);
H04N25/672 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (US);
H04N25/76 (KR);
H04N25/78 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | H04N3/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2016/37] |
Former [2009/27] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CMOS-BILDSENSORPIXELUNG MITHILFE EINER LICHTDIODE | [2009/03] | English: | CMOS IMAGE SENSOR PIXEL USING A PHOTODIODE | [2009/03] | French: | CAPTEUR CMOS DE PIXELS D'IMAGE UTILISANT UNE PHOTODIODE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 03.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1107581 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2002118289 (CHOI SOO-CHANG [KR]); | by applicant | EP1107581 |