EP2021635 - WAVE RELIEVING GEOMETRIC FEATURES IN STRUCTURAL MEMBERS THAT ARE RADIALLY EXPANDABLE INTO WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fatigue Technology, Inc. 401 Andover Park East Seattle, WA 98188-7605 / US | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLENN, Douglas, W. 800 South 219th Street, A-1 Des Moines, Washington 98198 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07776383.7 | 27.04.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US10291 | Priority number, date | US20060795888P | 27.04.2006 Original published format: US 795888 P | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127399 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2021635 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16B4/00, B23P9/02 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
F16B4/004 (EP,US);
B23P9/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WELLENENTLASTENDE GEOMETRISCHE MERKMALE VON RADIAL IN WERKSTÜCKE EXPANDIERBAREN STRUKTURELEMENTEN | [2009/07] | English: | WAVE RELIEVING GEOMETRIC FEATURES IN STRUCTURAL MEMBERS THAT ARE RADIALLY EXPANDABLE INTO WORKPIECES | [2009/07] | French: | CARACTÉRISTIQUES GÉOMÉTRIQUES DE DÉCHARGE POUR VAGUE DANS DES ÉLÉMENTS STRUCTURAUX DILATABLES RADIALEMENT À L'INTÉRIEUR DE PIÈCES | [2009/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0945919 (CEMBRE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-25 * paragraph [0048]; figures 1,3-5 * | by applicant | US3566662 | US3892121 | US4187708 | US4423619 | US4425780 | US4471643 | US4524600 | US4557033 | US4809420 | US4885829 | US4934170 | US5083363 | US5096349 | US5405228 | US5245743 | US5103548 | US5127254 | US5305627 | US5341559 | US5380136 | US5433100 | US7100264 | US7024908 | US2005025601 | EP0945919 | US20000603857 |