EP2030489 - X-RAY TRANSPARENT BED AND GURNEY EXTENDER FOR USE WITH MOBILE COMPUTERIZED TOMOGRAPHY (CT) IMAGING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurologica Corp. Danvers Industrial Park 14 Electronics Avenue Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYBINKOWSKI, Andrew, P. 39 Burning Bush Drive Boxford, MA 01921 / US | 02 /
NEMIROVSKY, Lidia 8 Kosciusko Street Salem, MA 01970 / US | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Engelhardt & Engelhardt Patentanwälte Postfach 13 50 D-88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2016/47] |
Former [2009/10] | Engelhardt & Engelhardt Patentanwälte Postfach 13 50 D-88003 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07777022.0 | 14.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US11495 | Priority number, date | US20060800107P | 12.05.2006 Original published format: US 800107 P | US20070706133 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: US 706133 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007133723 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030489 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030489 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05G1/00, G21K5/00, G21K5/08, A61B6/04, A47C31/00, A61G7/07, A61G1/04, A61B6/03, A61B6/00 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61G7/072 (EP);
A61B6/032 (EP);
A61B6/0442 (EP);
A61B6/4405 (EP);
A61G1/04 (EP);
A61G2210/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | H05G1/00, G21K5/00, G21K5/08, A61B6/04, A47C31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ERWEITERUNG FÜR RÖNTGENSTRAHLENDURCHLÄSSIGES BETT UND KRANKENTRAGE ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT MOBILEN CT-BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2009/10] | English: | X-RAY TRANSPARENT BED AND GURNEY EXTENDER FOR USE WITH MOBILE COMPUTERIZED TOMOGRAPHY (CT) IMAGING SYSTEMS | [2009/10] | French: | RALLONGE DE LIT ET DE CIVIÈRE ROULANTE TRANSPARENTE AUX RAYONS X DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉS AVEC DES SYSTÈMES MOBILES D'IMAGERIE TOMOGRAPHIQUE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 25.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 17.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2007 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | GB | 14.05.2017 | IE | 14.05.2017 | LU | 14.05.2017 | MT | 14.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 14.05.2007 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
IE | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
MT | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.05.2007 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
IE | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
MT | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.05.2007 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
IE | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
MT | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
IE | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
MT | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
IE | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
IE | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.05.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 14.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US3631241 (FRANKE FREDERICK R ET AL) [X] 1-5,8,9,18,21-23,25 * the whole document * [A] 20 [Y] 12-15,18,26-33 [I] 16,17,24; | [Y]DE4406493 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 12,14,15,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4064401 (MARDEN DANNY ALDEN) [Y] 12,13,26 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4971037 (PELTA SAMUEL [US]) [Y] 27-33 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004158926 (STEVENS PETER M [US] STEVEN PETER M [US]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5422928 (PAYNE CHAM N [US]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US4989849 (ZUPANCIC ANTON Z [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US4688780 (HANZ GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-5,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006013185 (SIEMENS AG [DE]; RUPP ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2405789 (ELEKTA AB [SE]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005004723 (SCHAERER MAYFIELD USA INC [US]; DINKLER CHARLES E [US]; NAUTA HARING J) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003084512 (FUJITA HIDEHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US6295671 (REESBY CYRIL F [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5771513 (KIRCHGEORG MARKUS [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5675851 (FEATHERS JOHN A [US]) [X] 1-5,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US5233713 (MURPHY LAWRENCE E [US] ET AL) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2938261 (DECKER KURT PROF DR [DE]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006083355 (LOSER MICHAEL [DE]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]DE29706436U (MAYR ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US4506872 (WESTERBERG HANS [SE] ET AL) [X] 1-5,18,21-23 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2005135560 (DAFNI EHUD [IL] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9,18,19,21-23,25 * the whole document * [I] 7 | International search | [X]US6217214 ; | [X]US6459923 ; | [Y]US2002039403 ; | [X]US6926441 |