EP2038883 - VOCODER AND ASSOCIATED METHOD THAT TRANSCODES BETWEEN MIXED EXCITATION LINEAR PREDICTION (MELP) VOCODERS WITH DIFFERENT SPEECH FRAME RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 West NASA Blvd. MS A-11 Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [2016/11] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 West NASA Blvd. MS A-11I Melbourne FL 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBERLAIN, Mark W. 740 H.F. Five Points Road Honeoye Falls, New York 14472 / US | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2009/13] | Schmidt, Steffen Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07784473.6 | 19.06.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007US71534 | Priority number, date | US20060425437 | 21.06.2006 Original published format: US 425437 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007149840 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2038883 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2038883 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/16 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G10L19/173 (EP,US);
G10L19/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | G10L19/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2016/11] |
Former [2009/30] | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOCODER UND DIESBEZÜGLICHES VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSKODIEREN ZWISCHEN MELP-VOCODERN (MIXED EXCITATION LINEAR PREDICTION) MIT VERSCHIEDENEN SPRACHRAHMENRATEN | [2009/13] | English: | VOCODER AND ASSOCIATED METHOD THAT TRANSCODES BETWEEN MIXED EXCITATION LINEAR PREDICTION (MELP) VOCODERS WITH DIFFERENT SPEECH FRAME RATES | [2009/13] | French: | VOCODEUR ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UN TRANSCODAGE ENTRE DES VOCODEURS À PRÉDICTION LINÉAIRE A EXCITATION MIXTE (MELP) AVEC DES VITESSES DE TRAME VOCALE DIFFERENTES | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 21.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0122403 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 2 * * page 10, lines 4-22 * * page 34, line 1 - page 36, line 27 *; | [A]US2004153317 (CHAMBERLAIN MARK W [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, par. [0028] * * page 4, par. [0046] - [0047] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - CHAMBERLAIN M W ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "A 600 BPS MELP vocoder for use on HF channels", MILCOM 2001. PROCEEDINGS. COMMUNICATIONS FOR NETWORK-CENTRIC OPERATIONS: CREATING THE INFORMATION FORCE. MCLEAN, VA, OCT. 28 - 30, 2001, IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011028), VOL. 1 OF 2, ISBN 0-7803-7225-5, pages 447 - 453, XP010579053 [A] 1,7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MILCOM.2001.985836 |