EP2054103 - AN IMPROVED WRAP FOR A HEART ASSIST DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunshine Heart Company Pty Ltd Suite3 385 Pacific Highway Crows Nest, NSW 2065 / AU | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Sunshine Heart Company Pty Ltd 3/12 Frederick Street St LeonardsNSW 2065 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE PLATER, Gemma 2/135 Brooke Street Coogee, NSW 2034 / AU | 02 /
MILLER, Scott, Hugh 35/10 Darley Road Manly, NSW 2095 / AU | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2019/22] |
Former [2009/48] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland 40/43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07784826.5 | 20.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007AU01188 | Priority number, date | AU20060904548 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: AU 2006904548 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008022379 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054103 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054103 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/12, A61B17/12 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,US);
A61M60/161 (EP,US);
A61M60/289 (EP,US);
A61M60/468 (EP,US);
A61M60/861 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/22] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER WICKEL FÜR EINE HERZUNTERSTÜTZENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2009/19] | English: | AN IMPROVED WRAP FOR A HEART ASSIST DEVICE | [2009/19] | French: | ENVELOPPE AMÉLIORÉE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE CARDIAQUE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 09.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2017 | 31.08.2017 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2007 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | IE | 20.08.2019 | LU | 20.08.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 20.08.2007 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.08.2019 | ||
LU | 20.08.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.08.2019 | ||
LU | 20.08.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.08.2019 | ||
LU | 20.08.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.08.2019 | ||
LU | 20.08.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 20.08.2019 | ||
LU | 20.08.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LU | 20.08.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 29.05.2019 | |
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 29.05.2019 | |
LT | 29.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4957477 (LUNDBAECK STIG S [SE]); | [X]US6616596 (MILBOCKER MICHAEL T [US]); | [X]US6626821 (KUNG ROBERT T V [US], et al); | [X]US6808483 (ORTIZ MARK [US], et al); | [AD]WO2005041783 (SUNSHINE HEART CO PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]WO2005110512 (PPA TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) |