EP2054332 - DELIVERY PIPE FOR THE TRANSPORT OF SOLIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esser -Werke GmbH & Co. KG Zum Puddelhammer 25 59581 Warstein / DE | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSER, Alexander Eulenweg 1a 59581 Warstein / DE | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Ksoll, Peter Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Ksoll, Peter Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll, Griepenstroh Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 07785689.6 | 03.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007DE01385 | Priority number, date | DE20061038989 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006038989 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008022616 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2054332 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/52, F16L57/06 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
F16L57/06 (EP,KR,US);
B65G53/523 (EP,KR,US);
E04G21/0418 (EP,US);
B65G2207/28 (KR);
B65G2207/48 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | FÖRDERROHR FÜR DEN FESTSTOFFTRANSPORT | [2009/19] | English: | DELIVERY PIPE FOR THE TRANSPORT OF SOLIDS | [2009/19] | French: | TUBE DE TRANSPORT POUR LE TRANSPORT DE MATIÈRES SOLIDES | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2008 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE19735335 (ESSER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,5-8,13* figure 5 *; | [DX]DE19809529 (ESSER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DX] 1-5,7,9-12,14,15 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US6520211 (ESSER ALEXANDER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,12 * figure 4 * | by applicant | DE19735335 | DE19809529 | EP1653140 |