EP2041197 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ORGANIC NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUNS, Matthias Jozef Gertruda Slakstraat 72 NL-6462 CV Kerkrade / NL | 02 /
FRIEDERICHS, Joseph Petronella Hofstraat 20 NL-6019 CC Wessem / NL | 03 /
JANSEN, Johan Franz Gradus Antonius Marisstraat 11 NL-6165 AP Geleen / NL | 04 /
DRIESSEN, Marco Marcus Matheus Roerstraat 25 NL-6051 LH Maasbracht / NL | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Martin John DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2014/46] |
Former [2009/14] | Kirk, Martin John DSM Intellectual Property Postbox 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 07786019.5 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007EP06187 | Priority number, date | EP20060014647 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06014647 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008006580 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2041197 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041197 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/01, C08G63/676, C09D151/00, C09D151/08, C08L51/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C08F263/00 (EP,US);
C08F267/06 (US);
C08F263/02 (EP,US);
C08F283/01 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C09D151/003 (EP,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3179 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31906 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D151/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ORGANISCHEN NANOTEILCHEN | [2013/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING ORGANIC NANOPARTICLES | [2009/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE NANOPARTICULES ORGANIQUES. | [2013/51] |
Former [2009/14] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ORGANISCHER NANOPARTIKEL | ||
Former [2009/14] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE NANOPARTICULES ORGANIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2007 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BE | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | GB | 12.07.2015 | IE | 12.07.2015 | LU | 12.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.07.2007 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 12.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.07.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 12.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.07.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 12.07.2015 | ||
IE | 12.07.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 12.07.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
GB | 12.07.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
LU | 12.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1720852 (GRACE W R & CO) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]GB1327111 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,21,20,17,18 * * page 1, lines 19-29 * * page 3, lines 23,24,20 * * page 3, line 59 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, lines 56-59 * * page 9, lines 33-37 * * page 5, lines 35-37 *; | [X]GB1380044 (ICI LTD) [X] 1-20 * claim 1 * * page 3, lines 6-12,38-40 * * page 2, lines 25,26,35-44; example - * * page 2, lines 13-15,49 *; | [A]GB1405923 (DESOTO INC) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-21 * * page 1, lines 22-69 *; | [A]US5416159 (JUDAY THOMAS W [US]) [A] 1-20 * claims 1,2 ** column 4, lines 15-33 *; | [X]WO0073361 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [X] 1-20 * claims 19-21,23 * * claims 1,3,5-7,11-13,18 * * page 5, line 9 - page 11, line 11 * * page 13, line 6 - page 17, line 23 * * page 19, line 7 - page 20, line 19 * * page 22, line 16 - page 23, line 10; example - *; | [X]US6242528 (CLARK MARK D [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 16 - column 9, line 1 * * column 10, lines 17-49; example - *; | [A]WO03093367 (ZHANG HAOLONG [CN]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005045525 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * claims 1-26 * |