EP2052017 - ANTISTATIC AND ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYURETHANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHBING, Hubert Rotdornweg 12 51519 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
KRAUSE, Jens Deutz-Mülheimer Str. 219 51063 Köln / DE | 03 /
LIEBEGOTT, Lutz Kämper Weg 13 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
FAEHLING, Friedhelm Morgendgraben 3 51061 Köln / DE | 05 /
EISEN, Norbert Ulmenallee 59a 50999 Köln / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 07786438.7 | 31.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007EP06739 | Priority number, date | DE20061037582 | 11.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037582 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008017399 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052017 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052017 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08K7/06 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K7/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08K7/06, C08L75/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | ANTISTATISCHE UND ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGE POLYURETHANE | [2009/18] | English: | ANTISTATIC AND ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYURETHANES | [2009/18] | French: | POLYURÉTHANNE ANTISTATIQUE ET CONDUCTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.2012
04.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan, et al, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.2012
04.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan, et al, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP, Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.2012
BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Steinbusch, Daniel Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02.08.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.12.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.06.2016 | 08.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.07.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2007 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | IE | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | ES | 08.01.2012 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | LU | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
LU | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3528597 (ELASTOGRAN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-9* the whole document *; | [DY]DE19858825 (RAEDER VOGEL RAEDER UND ROLLEN [DE]) [DY] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2004144963 (BRAIG THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0024] , [0162] , [0169] , [0258]; example -; claim 1 * [Y] 1-9 |