EP2069187 - SUPPORT PART FOR THE FRONT-END MODULE OF A PASSENGER VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/05] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPPLE, Jörg Greutstrasse 3 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
LOOTZE, Wolfgang Osianderstrasse 6 72768 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
WIESLER, Klaus Erwin-Mauz-Strasse 9 73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Moore, Derek, et al Jensen & Son 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Moore, Derek, et al Jensen & Son 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07786484.1 | 01.08.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007EP06796 | Priority number, date | DE20061047419 | 06.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006047419 | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008043402 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2069187 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069187 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B62D29/00, B60R21/34 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B62D25/084 (EP);
B62D29/001 (EP);
B62D29/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2009/25] | Title | German: | TRÄGERTEIL FÜR EIN FRONTENDMODUL EINES PERSONENKRAFTWAGENS | [2009/25] | English: | SUPPORT PART FOR THE FRONT-END MODULE OF A PASSENGER VEHICLE | [2009/25] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PORTEUR POUR UN MODULE FRONTAL D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.02.2012 | ES | 12.05.2012 | [2013/22] |
Former [2012/50] | IT | 01.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1213207 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022]; figures 1,3-5 * [A] ; | [XA]DE10002499 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * column 4, lines 24-56 * * column 4, lines 56-64 * * figure 1 * [A] 4; | [X]EP1036729 (REHAU SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0014] , [0022] - [0024]; figure - *; | [XP]DE102005055705 (HBPO GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0018]; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE10002499 | EP1213207 |