EP2056663 - APPARATUS FOR EXAMINING OR MONITORING PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peter Osypka Stiftung Stiftung des bürgerlichen Rechts Hornrain 31 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSYPKA, Peter Earl H. Wood Strasse 1 79618 Rheinfelden-Herten / DE | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Maucher Jenkins Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Kunst, Manuel Nikolaus Johannes, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786610.1 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007EP06987 | Priority number, date | DE20061041127 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041127 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025439 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056663 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01G7/00 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
A01G7/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/0098 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG ODER ÜBERWACHUNG VON PFLANZEN | [2009/20] | English: | APPARATUS FOR EXAMINING OR MONITORING PLANTS | [2009/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR EXAMINER OU SURVEILLER DES PLANTES | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1446999 (CYTOBIOTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,13,15,17,19 * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 51; figures 1,5 * [A] 6,8-10,14,16,18; | [XA]DE3722516 (MORI KEI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, lines 40-45 * * column 2, lines 13-62; figure 1 * [A] 5-19; | [A]US5819467 (ZUCKER JONATHAN M [US]) [A] 1,6-8 * column 1, lines 35-48; figure . * |