EP2051890 - COMPRESSED AIR SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILBERER, Eduard Am Damm 5 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Schönmann, Kurt c/o Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Schönmann, Kurt c/o Knorr-Bremse AG Patentabteilung V/RG Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786626.7 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007EP07026 | Priority number, date | DE20061037311 | 08.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037311 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008017475 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051890 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2051890 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/00 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP,US);
B01D53/0415 (EP,US);
B01D53/261 (EP,US);
Y10S55/17 (EP,US);
Y10T137/598 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49405 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKLUFTVERSORGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/18] | English: | COMPRESSED AIR SUPPLY DEVICE | [2009/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN AIR COMPRIMÉ | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | HU | 27.07.2011 | IE | 27.07.2011 | LT | 27.07.2011 | LV | 27.07.2011 | MT | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | TR | 27.07.2011 | LU | 08.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | GB | 27.10.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | IS | 27.11.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GB | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GB | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
LT | 27.07.2011 | ||
LV | 27.07.2011 | ||
MT | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
IS | 27.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | MT | 27.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0234229 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4-13,15,16,18 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0608606 (BENDIX HVCG EUROP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,13,16 * abstract *; | [X]US5595588 (BLEVINS JERRY R [US]) [X] 1,13,16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004094036 (NICHOLS RANDALL W [US], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005051521 (HALDEX BRAKE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,13,16* abstract * | by applicant | EP0234229 | EP0608606 | US5595588 | US2004094036 | WO2005051521 |