EP2049016 - DEVICE HAVING A DIRECTLY DRIVEN ROTATING BODY AND AN AEROSTATIC BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/17] | DEVICE HAVING A DIRECTLY DRIVEN ROTATING BODY AND AETOSTATIC BEARING | ||
[2012/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AeroLas GmbH Aerostatische Lager-Lasertechnik Inselkammerstrasse 10 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTH, Michael Wichernweg 12 81737 München / DE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Schlimme, Wolfram Haidgraben 2 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2012/29] |
Former [2009/17] | Schlimme, Wolfram Haidgraben 2 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 07786659.8 | 10.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007EP07098 | Priority number, date | DE20061037543 | 10.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037543 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008017498 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049016 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049016 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B6/03, F16C32/06, G01N23/04 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
A61B6/035 (EP,US);
A61B6/56 (EP,US);
F16C32/0618 (EP,US);
F16C32/0666 (EP,US);
F16C2300/14 (EP,US);
F16C2316/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM DIREKT ANGETRIEBENEN ROTATIONSKÖRPER UND EINEM AEROSTATISCHEN LAGER | [2012/10] | English: | DEVICE HAVING A DIRECTLY DRIVEN ROTATING BODY AND AN AEROSTATIC BEARING | [2012/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF POURVU D'UN CORPS DE ROTATION A ENTRAINEMENT DIRECT ET D'UN PALIER AEROSTATIQUE | [2012/14] |
Former [2009/17] | VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM DIREKT ANGETRIEBENEN ROTATIONSKÖRPER UND AEROSTATISCHES LAGER | ||
Former [2009/17] | DEVICE HAVING A DIRECTLY DRIVEN ROTATING BODY AND AETOSTATIC BEARING | ||
Former [2009/17] | DISPOSITIF POURVU D'UN CORPS DE ROTATION À ENTRAÎNEMENT DIRECT, ET PALIER AÉROSTATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 27.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2007 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | LT | 18.07.2012 | LV | 18.07.2012 | MT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | PL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | IE | 10.08.2012 | LU | 10.08.2012 | AT | 31.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | FR | 18.09.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | GB | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | IS | 18.11.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
LU | 10.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 18.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 18.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 18.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 18.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 18.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 10.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 18.07.2012 | |
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 18.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DXAY]WO02089671 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DX] 16-18 * page 4, line 11 - page 9, line 32 * * figures 1-3,5A-B * [A] 13,14,19,20 [Y] 1-12,15; | [Y]US2004017895 (SUZUKI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12,15 * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0116] * * figures 7A-D *; | [XA]US2004062356 (BRUNNETT WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 16-18 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 1-15,19,20; | [XA]US3351394 (HOOKER RALPH J) [X] 16-18 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 19,20; | [XA]DE19745216 (HEINZL JOACHIM PROF DR [DE], et al) [X] 16-18 * column 6, line 9 - column 9, line 14; figure 2 * [A] 19,20; | [PX]WO2006089741 (AEROLAS GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 16-18 * column W *; | [A]WO2005102171 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 15 - page 8, line 11 * * figures 1,2A-B,4-6 *; | [A]DE3815029 (INTERATOM [DE]) [A] 16-20 * column A * * column 1, line 34 - column 3, line 9 * * figure 1; claim 5 *; | [DA]DE4436156 (HEINZL JOACHIM [DE], et al) [DA] 16,19,20 * column W *; | [A]EP0215523 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,15 * column A * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 34 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2005116558 (YOKOYAMA AKIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * column W *; | [A]US5608771 (STEIGERWALD ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 9 * * figures 3,4,7 * | by applicant | WO02089671 |