EP2035489 - AMINOSILOXANE OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluestar Silicones France SAS 21 avenue Georges Pompidou 69003 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2009/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Nadia 148, rue Duguesclin F-69006 Lyon / FR | 02 /
GIRAUD, Yves 11, rue du Brulet F-69110 Sainte Foy Les Lyon / FR | 03 /
DERUELLE, Martial 7 chemin de la Civaude F-69440 Mornant / FR | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07786928.7 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007EP56554 | Priority number, date | FR20060005938 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0605938 | [2009/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000814 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2035489 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035489 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/03, D06M15/643, C04B41/49, B05D5/08 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
D06M15/6436 (EP,KR);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08J3/03 (EP,KR);
C08J2383/08 (EP,KR);
D06M2200/12 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOSILOXAN-ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSION | [2009/12] | English: | AMINOSILOXANE OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION | [2009/12] | French: | EMULSION HUILE DANS EAU D'AMINOSILOXANES | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IE | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | MT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | LU | 29.06.2011 | BE | 30.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 29.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
LU | 29.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
BE | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2354372 (DOW CORNING LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * page 2, lines 1-19 * * page 3, lines 7-20 * * page 5, lines 3-7; claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0378828 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 6, line 30 - page 9, line 30 *; | [A]US5000861 (YANG SUE-LEIN L [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 7, lines 15-36; claim - *; | [A]DD298651 (BUNA AG [DE]) [A] 1-9* claim -; table 2 *; | [A]EP0870863 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * example 1; claim - *; | [DX]EP1632521 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [DX] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0015] , [0033] , [0039]; claim - * | by applicant | FR2354372 |