EP2123111 - LOUDSPEAKER ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications AB 221 88 Lund / SE | [2013/34] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB 221 88 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGHULT, Gunnar Änggatan 10 A S-223 59 Lund / SE | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Bengtsson, Peggy Katrin Zacco Sweden AB Studentgatan 4 Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | [2013/34] |
Former [2009/48] | Bengtsson, Peggy Katrin Albihns AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 07787449.3 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007EP57178 | Priority number, date | US20070625404 | 22.01.2007 Original published format: US 625404 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008089853 | Date: | 31.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123111 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123111 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R23/00, F03G7/06 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
H04R23/00 (EP,US);
H04R7/16 (EP,KR,US);
F03G7/06 (KR);
H04R7/24 (EP,US);
H04R2201/00 (KR);
H04R2499/11 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHER-STELLGLIED | [2009/48] | English: | LOUDSPEAKER ACTUATOR | [2009/48] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DE HAUT-PARLEUR | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2007 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | FI | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.07.2007 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
MT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
FI | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2362719 (VIRTUAL VIDEO UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10,16 * abstract ** page 10, paragraph 5; figure 1 *; | [XA]US6563934 (SWOPE CHARLES B [US], et al) [X] 16 * abstract * * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 50; figures 4,5 * [A] 1-15,17-23; | [A]WO2005075823 (UNIV AUSTRALIAN [AU], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 10; figure 1 * * page 20, line 18 - page 21, line 30; figure 4 *; | [XA] - Y. H. TEH & R. FEATHERSTONE, "Experiments on the Audio Frequency Response of Shape Memory Alloy Actuators", AUSTRALASIAN CONF. ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ACRA 2005), Sydney, Australia, (2005), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://users.rsise.anu.edu.au/~roy/SMA/acra05paper.pdf, (20070919), XP002451540 [X] 10,16,23 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,11-15,17-22 | by applicant | GB2362719 | US6563934 | WO2005075823 |