EP2046277 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS COMPRISING N-ACETYLCYSTEINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAMBON S.p.A. Via Lillo del Duca, 10 20091 Bresso (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states ZAMBON S.p.A. Via Lillo del Duca, 10 20091 Bresso MI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMPOLDI, Luca Via Verdi, 5 I-20020 Lainate / IT | 02 /
MORETTO, Alberto Via Aosta, 2 I-35020 Ponte San Nicolò / IT | 03 /
GRASSANO, Alessandro Via Volturno, 21 I-20052 Monza / IT | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al MARCHI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07787539.1 | 13.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007EP57271 | Priority number, date | EP20060015440 | 25.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06015440 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008012220 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2046277 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046277 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/44, A61Q19/00, A61K8/60 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61K8/447 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/732 (EP,US);
A61K8/86 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN MIT N-ACETYLCYSTEIN | [2009/16] | English: | COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL PREPARATIONS COMPRISING N-ACETYLCYSTEINE | [2009/16] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS COSMÉTIQUES OU DERMATOLOGIQUES CONTENANT DE LA N-ACÉTYLCYSTÉINE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2011 | BE | 19.01.2011 | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | MT | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | IE | 13.07.2011 | LU | 13.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 19.01.2011 | |
BE | 19.01.2011 | ||
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 19.01.2011 | |
CY | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004217589 ; | [X]FR2675046 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 32-35 ** page 5, lines 9-11; claims 1,6 *; | [DX]US5733535 (HOLLINGSHEAD JUDITH ANN [US], et al) [DX] 1,11,15 * examples I-III *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 56, Database accession no. 2004-575398, XP002455493 & JP2004217589 A 20040805 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |