EP2043709 - A MEDICAL DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH A ROTATABLE CODING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2017/44] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIANSEN, VOSS, Asger Storstrømsvej 25 B DK-4862 Guldborg / DK | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2017/44] |
Former [2012/19] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07787551.6 | 15.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP57283 | Priority number, date | EP20060014769 | 15.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06014769 | EP20060118846 | 14.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06118846 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008009646 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2043709 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043709 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2043709 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/31 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/00 (US);
A61M5/3135 (EP,US);
A61M2005/2488 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6045 (EP,US);
A61M5/31535 (US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES ABGABEYSTEM MIT DREHBAREM VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSELEMENT | [2009/15] | English: | A MEDICAL DELIVERY SYSTEM WITH A ROTATABLE CODING ELEMENT | [2009/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION MÉDICALE PRÉSENTANT UN ÉLÉMENT DE CODAGE ROTATIF | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
10.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02
02.11.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
10.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
02.11.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
10.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02
02.11.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
10.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | ||
02
02.11.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | |||
Former [2015/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
10.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | ||
02
02.11.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Frantz, Markus Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
10.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Fuchs, Alexander Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Epping Hermann Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
02
02.11.2011
09.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Ypsomed AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH Opponent's representative Frantz, Markus Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 D-81677 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.10.2011
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Fuchs, Alexander Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Epping Hermann Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | 05.12.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.01.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.05.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.09.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 27.03.2017 | Appeal received No. T0758/17 | 15.05.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.02.2011 | BE | 02.02.2011 | CY | 02.02.2011 | CZ | 02.02.2011 | DK | 02.02.2011 | EE | 02.02.2011 | FI | 02.02.2011 | HU | 02.02.2011 | IT | 02.02.2011 | LT | 02.02.2011 | MT | 02.02.2011 | NL | 02.02.2011 | PL | 02.02.2011 | RO | 02.02.2011 | SE | 02.02.2011 | SI | 02.02.2011 | SK | 02.02.2011 | TR | 02.02.2011 | BG | 02.05.2011 | GR | 03.05.2011 | ES | 13.05.2011 | IS | 02.06.2011 | PT | 02.06.2011 | IE | 15.07.2011 | LU | 15.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2018/24] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
HU | 02.02.2011 | ||
IT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
TR | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.07.2011 | ||
LU | 15.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
MT | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
TR | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.07.2011 | ||
LU | 15.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
RO | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SK | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
EE | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 02.02.2011 | |
BE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 02.02.2011 | |
CY | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
LT | 02.02.2011 | ||
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
SI | 02.02.2011 | ||
BG | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.02.2011 | |
LV | 02.02.2011 | ||
PL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
IS | 02.06.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5611783 (MIKKELSEN S REN [DK]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0774270 (DIESSE DI SOSTER CARMEN & C [IT]) [Y] 1-5,7,12-19 * the whole document *; | [DY]DE20110690U (SPYRA HEINRICH [DE]) [DY] 1-5,7,12-19 * figure - *; | [DA]WO03017915 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [DA] 1-19 * figure - *; | [DA]US6648859 (BITDINGER RALF V [US], et al) [DA] 1-19* figure - * | Opposition | EP0832661 | US5743889 | US5957896 | WO0035519 | WO0172361 | US6582399 | WO03097131 | US2006153693 |