EP2049294 - CRANKSHAFT MILLING CUTTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALTER Aktiengesellschaft Derendinger Strasse 53 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAUPP, Berthold Wasenstrasse 4 72135 Dettenhausen / DE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstrasse 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07787706.6 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007EP57448 | Priority number, date | DE20061034673 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006034673 | [2009/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008012254 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049294 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23C3/06, B23C5/24 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
B23C3/06 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/2462 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/0472 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/128 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2200/367 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2220/44 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2240/24 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/1908 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303752 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30952 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURBELWELLENFRÄSER | [2009/17] | English: | CRANKSHAFT MILLING CUTTER | [2009/17] | French: | FRAISEUSE DE VILEBREQUINS | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 15.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3242553 (RICHARD BOGSTEN ANDERS) [X] 12-15,17,20 * the whole document * [Y] 10,16,29,30; | [X]DE19609239 (NAXOS UNION SCHLEIFMITTEL [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 36; figure 2 *; | [X]DE19749940 (BOEHRINGER WERKZEUGMASCHINEN [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 36 - column 10, line 54; figures 1-3; claims 1,4,14 *; | [Y]EP1356885 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [Y] 10,16,29,30 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1,2,8 *; | [X]US2004156688 (MATHEIS KLAUS [DE]) [X] 12-20 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]FR2858947 (SAFETY [FR]) [A] 13,14* page 2, line 26 - page 6, line 20; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE10218630 |