EP2053931 - LIQUID SATIETY ENHANCING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3012 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2009/19] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3012 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOERS, Hanny, Margriet Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
STROM, Anna, Helena, Edvardsdotter Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
WISEMAN, Sheila, Ann Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2012/06] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
BOERS, Hanny, Margriet Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
02 /
STROM, Anna, Helena, Edvardsdotter Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | |||
03 /
WISEMAN, Sheila, Ann Unilever R & D Vlaardingen Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Representative(s) | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Tjon, Hon Kong Guno Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2012/06] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2009/19] | Wurfbain, Gilles L. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 07787734.8 | 19.07.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007EP57476 | Priority number, date | EP20060119434 | 24.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06119434 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008022857 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053931 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053931 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0524, A23L1/0532, A23L2/52, A23L1/29, A23L2/02, A23L1/308 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L29/231 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L33/22 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5026, A23V2250/50722, A23V2200/15, A23V2200/332 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE, DAS VÖLLEGEFÜHL VERSTÄRKENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/19] | English: | LIQUID SATIETY ENHANCING COMPOSITION | [2009/19] | French: | COMPOSITION LIQUIDE AUGMENTANT LA SATIÉTÉ | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2007 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | LU | 19.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
LU | 19.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2008408 (ROUSSEL LAB LTD) [A] 1-11* example 1; claim 1 *; | [DXY]US5866190 (BAREY PHILIPPE [FR]) [DX] 1-9,11 * examples 1-6; claims 1,6,8,9 * * column 2, lines 42-44 * * column 3, lines 19-41 * [Y] 10; | [DA]WO02096219 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [DA] 1-11 * examples 1-6; claims 1,3-8,19 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 2 * * page 12, lines 1-15 * * page 15, lines 8-20 *; | [XY]WO03003849 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-9,11 * examples 1-6; claims 1,6-9 * * page 4, paragraph 6 * [Y] 10; | [DAY]WO03053169 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-9,11 * example 1; claims 1,9,14 * * page 3, line 17 - page 9, line 30 * [Y] 10; | [DXY]EP1338210 (PROTEIN TECH INT [US]) [DX] 1-9,11 * examples 1-11; claims 1,2,6,15-18 * [Y] 10; | [AY]WO03086360 (BEISEL GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1-9,11 * page 2, lines 3-30; examples 1-5; claims 1,3,4,8 * * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 20 * [Y] 10; | [DA]EP1488812 (MEDRX CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-11 * page 5, paragraphs 41,42,44; examples 1,3,6,9,10,13,15; claims 1-4,10,18 * * page 6, paragraph 48 *; | [A]EP1588629 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [A] 1-11 * examples 1-3; claims 1,5,9 *; | [DXY] - MANCINI F MCHUGH T H, "Fruit-alginate interactions in novel restructured products", NAHRUNG - FOOD, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, WEINHEIM, XX, (2000), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0027-769X, pages 152 - 157, XP002960558 [DX] 1-9,11 * page 154, paragraphs 1,6 - page 156, paragraphs 2,6,8-10 * [Y] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3803(20000501)44:3<152::AID-FOOD152>3.0.CO;2-8 |