EP2044673 - AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEKKALMAZ, Tekin Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ALBAS CIRPANLI, Gunsu Arcelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
AYVAZOGLU, Cumhur E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
TEKKALMAZ, Tekin E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | ||
02 /
ALBAS CIRPANLI, Gunsu E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | |||
03 /
AYVAZOGLU, Cumhur E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri, Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 07787763.7 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007EP57509 | Priority number, date | TR20060003877 | 25.07.2006 Original published format: TR 200603877 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008012271 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044673 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044673 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K17/26 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H02K1/276 (EP);
H02K21/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR | [2009/15] | English: | AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2009/15] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | BE | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | MT | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | IE | 20.07.2010 | LU | 20.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.07.2010 | ||
LU | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IE | 20.07.2010 | ||
IT | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
IT | 20.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05146103 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2001258187 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [YD]EP1519471 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [YD] 1-3 * paragraphs [0074] - [0083]; figures 14-22 *; | [A]JP2006042582 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-3* abstract * | by applicant | JP2001258187 | US2004256939 | EP1519471 |