EP2046191 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING AN ANALYTE IN AN EYE FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EyeSense AG Elisabethenstrasse 3 4051 Basel / CH | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Achim Auf der Stichel 10A 63762 Grossostheim / DE | 02 /
HERBRECHTSMEIER, Peter Friedrich-Stoltze-Strasse 10 61462 Königstein / DE | 03 /
HABERSTROH, Klaus Talstrasse 9 78351 Bodman-Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
GRULER, Roman Mittelstadtstr. 63 78628 Rottweil / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Stößel, Matthias, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Stößel, Matthias, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Bad Kreuznacher Straße 27-29 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Stößel, Matthias Herzog Fiesser & Partner Bad Kreuznacher Straße 27-29 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Isenbruck, Günter Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07787823.9 | 23.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007EP57580 | Priority number, date | EP20060015332 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06015332 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008012287 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2046191 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B3/18 (KR);
A61B5/14 (KR);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (KR);
A61B2560/0223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINES ANALYTEN IN EINER AUGENFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2009/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING AN ANALYTE IN AN EYE FLUID | [2009/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER UN ANALYTE DANS UN LIQUIDE OCULAIRE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2011 | 03.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/35] | 20.02.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6122042 (WUNDERMAN IRWIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,9,11-13,15-27 * column 1, line 14 - line 20 * * column 11, line 26 - line 29 * * column 26, line 34 - line 41 * * column 36, line 26 - line 32 * * column 43, line 56 - line 61 *; | [A]US2003086073 (BRAIG JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,25-27 * paragraphs [0067] , [0068] *; | [A]US2004138539 (JAY PAUL R [CA], et al) [A] 1,5,6,25-27 * paragraph [0060] *; | [DY]WO2004071287 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DY] 1-4,9,11-13,15-27 * page 3, line 10 - line 19 * * page 5, line 15 - line 17 * * page 10, line 22 - line 27 *; | [A]US2005121322 (SAY JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,25-27* paragraphs [0280] - [0285] *; | [A]GB2409033 (LEIN APPLIED DIAGNOSTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6,25-27 * page 13, line 27 - line 31 * | by applicant | US3120472 | WO0113783 | WO02087429 | WO2004071287 |