EP2059884 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR DISPLAYING MARKS IN AN IMAGE DATA SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeVis BreastCare GmbH & Co. KG Universitätsallee 29 28359 Bremen / DE | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVERTSZ, Carl J.G. Schumannstrasse 12 28213 Bremen / DE | 02 /
BÖDICKER, Anke Millstaetter Strasse 19 28359 Bremen / DE | 03 /
KRISHNAN, Sriram 6 Avondale Circle Exton, PA 19341 / US | 04 /
KRISHNAPURAM, Balaji 1021 Penn Circle, E612 King of Prussia, PA-19406 / US | 05 /
RAO, R. Bharat 2060 St. Andrews Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 06 /
O'DELL, Dennis 26 Foxcroft Lane Phoenixville, Pennsylvania 19460 / US | 07 /
GUPTA, Alok 813 Northwinds Drive Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania 19010 / US | [2009/31] |
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
EVERTSZ, Carl J.G. Schumannstrasse 12 28213 Bremen / DE | ||
02 /
BÖDICKER, Anke Millstaetter Strasse 19 28359 Bremen / DE | |||
03 /
KRISHNAN, Sriram 6 Avondale Circle Exton, PA 19341 / US | |||
04 /
KRISHNAPURAM, Balaji 800 Kimberton Road Apt. N-12 Phoenixville, Pennsylvania 19460 / US | |||
05 /
RAO, R. Bharat 2060 St. Andrews Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | |||
06 /
O'DELL, Dennis 26 Foxcroft Lane Phoenixville, Pennsylvania 19460 / US | |||
07 /
GUPTA, Alok 813 Northwinds Drive Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania 19010 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07788463.3 | 16.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007EP58539 | Priority number, date | US20060465078 | 16.08.2006 Original published format: US 465078 | US20060465074 | 16.08.2006 Original published format: US 465074 | US20060465386 | 17.08.2006 Original published format: US 465386 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020062 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059884 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
G06T19/00 (EP,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
G06T2210/41 (EP);
G06T2219/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM ANZEIGEN VON MARKIERUNGEN IN EINEM BILDDATENSATZ | [2009/21] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR DISPLAYING MARKS IN AN IMAGE DATA SET | [2009/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE CONÇUS POUR AFFICHER DES REPÈRES DANS UN ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES IMAGES | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/46] | 07.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2013 | 07.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005001742 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US]) [X] 1-29 * page 5, line 20 - page 18, line 3 ** claims 1,3,4 * | by applicant | WO2005001742 |