EP2057068 - METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF A VESSEL, AND VESSEL HAVING A PROPULSION SYSTEM WITH WASTE HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIGGES, Kay Steinfeldstr. 34 21698 Harsefeld / DE | 02 /
BONEFELD, Claus Torsvang 107 DK-2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | 03 /
KAHLE, Jens Böttgerstr. 49 22851 Norderstedt / DE | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/08] | Application number, filing date | 07788481.5 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007EP58578 | Priority number, date | DE20061040857 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006040857 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025688 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057068 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057068 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/06, B63H21/10, B63H21/14, B63H21/20, B63J3/02, F01K15/04, F01K23/10 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
F01K23/065 (EP);
B63H21/06 (KR);
B63H21/10 (KR);
B63H21/20 (EP);
B63J3/02 (EP,KR);
F01K15/04 (EP,KR);
B63H2021/205 (EP);
B63J2002/125 (EP);
Y02T70/50 (EP);
Y02T70/5236 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SCHIFFES SOWIE SCHIFF MIT EINEM ANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT ABWÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2009/20] | English: | METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF A VESSEL, AND VESSEL HAVING A PROPULSION SYSTEM WITH WASTE HEAT RECOVERY | [2009/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN BATEAU ET BATEAU ÉQUIPÉ D'UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT AVEC RÉCUPÉRATION DE LA CHALEUR PERDUE | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 02.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2007 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | IT | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | GB | 17.08.2012 | LU | 17.08.2012 | AT | 31.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | FR | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.08.2012 | ||
LU | 17.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
FR | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 17.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1159090 (WARNOWWERFT WARNEMUENDE VEB [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2479130 (MOSS ROSENBERG VERFT AS [NO]) [Y] 1-8 * page 7, line 12 - line 24; figure - *; | [Y]JPS57121996 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS57126793 (TANAKA HIYOUE) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006072791 (PETER BROTHERHOOD LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract * |