EP2041865 - CONTROLLING SWITCHING MODE POWER SUPPLY OF POWER AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAPOJA, Sami Lokitie 43 A 1 FI-00980 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
GRIGORE, Vlad Vähätorpankuja 3 C 02180 Espoo / FI | 03 /
KANGASMAA, Seppo Punavuorenkatu 2 B 21 FI-00120 Helsinki / FI | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Brockman, Pertti Erik Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Brockman, Pertti Erik Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 07788776.8 | 28.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007FI50401 | Priority number, date | FI20060005457 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: FI 20065457 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000916 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041865 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 03.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/02, H04B1/40, H04J13/04, H03F3/24 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
H02M1/44 (EP,US);
H03F1/0238 (EP,US);
H03F3/24 (EP,US);
H04B1/0475 (EP,US);
H04B1/525 (EP,US);
H04B15/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | H03F1/02, H04B1/40, H04J13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DES SCHALTNETZTEILS EINES LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKERS | [2009/14] | English: | CONTROLLING SWITCHING MODE POWER SUPPLY OF POWER AMPLIFIER | [2009/14] | French: | COMMANDE D'UNE ALIMENTATION À DÉCOUPAGE D'UN AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004100328 (MELANSON JOHN LAURENCE [US]) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0009] , [0014] - [0022]; figure 1 *; | [I]US5537305 (COLOTTI JAMES [US]) [I] 1-17 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 4 * * figure 4 *; | [I]US2003083025 (MARUO NOBUHIDE [JP], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0009] * | International search | [X]US2006072350 (MITROSKY JAMES S [US], et al); | [A]US2004080364 (SANDER WENDELL B [US], et al); | [A]US2004203544 (LEVESQUE CHRIS [US], et al); | [A]US2004251962 (ROSNELL SEPPO [FI], et al); | [A]US2005088226 (ROBINSON IAN [US], et al); | [A]US5905407 (MIDYA PALLAB [US]); | [A] - KETOLA J. ET AL., "Transmitter utilizing bandpass delta-sigma modulator and switching mode power amplifier", PROC. INT. SYMP. ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS'04), (20040523), vol. 1, pages 633 - 636, XP008101692 | [A] - RAAB F. ET AL., "Power amplifiers and transmitters for RF and microwave", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (200203), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 814 - 826, XP002237573 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.989965 |