EP2102560 - SYSTEM FOR INTRODUCING AN ADDITIVE INTO A FLUID CONDUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sheppard, Christopher 38 Chantry Grove Church Street Royston South Yorkshire S71 4QR / GB | [2012/04] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Sheppard, Christopher 3 Goldsmith Drive Newport Pagnell Milton Keynes MK16 8ED / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/18] |
Former [2012/39] | Wilson, Timothy James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Butler, Michael John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07789268.5 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007GB03166 | Priority number, date | GB20060016575 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: GB 0616575 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023156 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102560 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/00, C02F1/68 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
F24D19/0092 (EP,GB,US);
C02F1/686 (EP,GB,US);
F24D19/10 (GB);
F28G9/00 (GB);
F28F19/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8376 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR EINLEITUNG EINES ADDITIVS IN EINE FLUIDLEITUNG | [2009/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR INTRODUCING AN ADDITIVE INTO A FLUID CONDUIT | [2009/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À INTRODUIRE UN ADDITIF DANS UN CONDUIT DE FLUIDE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/38] | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2013 | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 09.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 09.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2011 | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2012 | 31.08.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US1745541 (JENNINGS RICHARD A) [X] 1,5-8,10,14,20,21,23 * the whole document * [A] 22; | [X]DE19516724 (JUDO WASSERAUFBEREITUNG [DE]) [X] 1,5-9,14,16,20,21,23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2124244 (EARL CHERNOSKY FRANK) [X] 1,22 * the whole document *; | [XP]GB2431711 (STRONG RICHARD [GB]) [XP] 1,5-8,10-12,14,20,21,23 * the whole document * | Examination | FR2707106 | AT409624B | WO9616299 |