EP2035677 - ABNORMALITY DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTAKE AIR TEMPERATURE SENSOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAI, Atsushi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2009/12] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 07789468.1 | 03.07.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007IB01810 | Priority number, date | JP20060185606 | 05.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006185606 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008004081 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2035677 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2035677 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02D41/06 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
G01K15/00 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0414 (EP,US);
F02D2250/14 (EP,US);
F02D41/06 (EP,US);
F02D41/182 (EP,US);
G01K2205/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/41] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIAGNOSE VON ANOMALIEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINEN ZULUFTTEMPERATURSENSOR FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2009/12] | English: | ABNORMALITY DIAGNOSTIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INTAKE AIR TEMPERATURE SENSOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2009/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC D'ANOMALIE DANS UNE SONDE DE TEMPÉRATURE D'AIR D'ADMISSION D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 11.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10329039 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10329038 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,7-10,15-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004040104 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005119040 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,15-18 * the whole document * |