EP2041866 - CLASS D AUDIO AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOOPER, Lutsen c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | 02 /
BERKHOUT, Marco c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | [2018/52] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
DOOPER, Lutsen c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | ||
02 /
BERKHOUT, Marco c/o NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 A-1102 Vienna / AT | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/14] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2009/14] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH IP Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 07789880.7 | 04.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007IB52614 | Priority number, date | EP20060116800 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06116800 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008007308 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041866 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041866 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/217, H03G3/30, H03G11/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
H03F3/217 (EP,US);
H03G11/008 (EP,US);
H03F2200/345 (EP,US);
H03F2200/351 (EP,US);
H03F2200/66 (EP,US);
H03F2200/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2009/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLASSE-D-AUDIOVERSTÄRKER | [2009/14] | English: | CLASS D AUDIO AMPLIFIER | [2009/14] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR AUDIO DE CLASSE D | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2007 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | GB | 04.07.2019 | IE | 04.07.2019 | LU | 04.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.07.2007 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 04.07.2019 | ||
IE | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 04.07.2019 | ||
LU | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
GB | 04.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0184280 (BOSE CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 5, line 3 - page 12, line 21; figures 1,2 * * page 23, lines 9-21 *; | [X]WO2004047299 (ULRICK JOHN W [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 3, line 18 - page 21, line 1; figures 1,3,4,6 *; | [X]WO0022727 (INTERSIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 27; figures 1,3,6 *; | [X]US5838210 (MIDYA PALLAB [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 20; figures 2,7 *; | [A]EP1049248 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | - NIELSEN K, "PEDEC-a novel pulse referenced control method for high quality digital PWM switching power amplification", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 1998. PESC 98 RECORD. 29TH A NNUAL IEEE FUKUOKA, JAPAN 17-22 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980517), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/PESC.1998.701900, ISBN 978-0-7803-4489-1, pages 200 - 207, XP010294870 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1998.701900 |