EP2050789 - POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN COMPOSITION, MOLDED BODY THEREOF AND POLYLACTIC ACID COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URAKAMI, Tatsuhiro c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI, Choujirou c/o MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC., 580-32, Nagaura Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 2990265 / JP | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07790648.5 | 11.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007JP63844 | Priority number, date | JP20060203876 | 26.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006203876 | [2009/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013059 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050789 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2050789 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/60, C08K5/00, C08L67/04, C08G63/06 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
C08K5/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/60 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/0083 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/005 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0083, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/20, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
C08L67/04, C08L2666/18 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | C08L67/04, C08G63/06, C08J5/00, C08K5/20, C08L101/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/19] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYMILCHSÄUREHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FORMKÖRPER DARAUS UND POLYMILCHSÄUREVERBINDUNG | [2009/17] | English: | POLYLACTIC ACID RESIN COMPOSITION, MOLDED BODY THEREOF AND POLYLACTIC ACID COMPOUND | [2009/17] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE, CORPS MOULÉ ASSOCIÉ ET COMPOSÉ D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2009 | Translation filed | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 27.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0618250 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [I] 1,7,15 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 1; example - *; | [X]EP0669358 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,15 * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 25 * * page 7, lines 23-31 *; | [I]JPH09176295 ; | [A]EP0780428 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 10,14 * page 5, lines 3-34 * * page 7, lines 3-5; example - *; | [A]US2005001349 (YOSIMURA MASAHUMI [JP], et al) [A] 10,14 * page 2, paragraphs 12-24 *; | [A]US2006030690 (MIHARA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 8,9 * page 2, paragraphs 24,30 * * page 3, paragraphs 36-37 * * page 5, paragraph 73 * | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 28, Database accession no. 1998-315272, XP002605892 & JPH09176295 A 19970708 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [I] 1,7,15 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH09158021 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS, et al); | [X]JP2000344877 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JPH10182801 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [X]JPH08199054 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]JP2006016605 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [XP]JP2006335904 (TOHCELLO CO LTD); | [AP]JP2007091769 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [AP]JP2007016091 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JP2003192884 | JPH09278991 | JP2004285121 | EP0780428 |