EP2048436 - ILLUMINATING DEVICE, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE PROVIDED WITH THE ILLUMINATING DEVICE AND PORTABLE TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenovo Innovations Limited (Hong Kong) 23rd Floor, Lincoln House Taikoo Place, 979 King's Road Quarry Bay, Hong Kong / HK | [2016/22] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIROTA, Hideyuki c/o NEC Saitama, Ltd. 300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara Kamikawamachi, Kodama-gun Saitama 3670297 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
SHIROTA, Hideyuki c/o NEC Saitama, Ltd. 300-18, Aza Toyohara, Oaza Motohara Kamikawamachi, Kodama-gun Saitama 3670297 / JP | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07791311.9 | 25.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007JP64595 | Priority number, date | JP20060205920 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006205920 | [2009/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013204 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048436 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2048436 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00, G02F1/1335, G02F1/1333 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
G02B6/0088 (EP,US);
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02F1/133317 (EP,US);
G02F1/133322 (EP,US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
G02F2201/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/04] | F21V8/00, G02F1/13357, F21Y101/02, G02B6/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/16] | F21V8/00, G02F1/13357, F21Y101/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/33] |
Former [2009/35] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, MIT DER BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG VERSEHENE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT | [2009/16] | English: | ILLUMINATING DEVICE, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE PROVIDED WITH THE ILLUMINATING DEVICE AND PORTABLE TERMINAL DEVICE | [2009/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES DOTÉ DU DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL PORTABLE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2009 | Translation filed | 26.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 03.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 25.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000214332 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [IA]US2003016313 (JEONG SEUNG-CHUL [KR]) [I] 3,4 * the whole document * [A] 1,2; | [A]US6512557 (MIWA TOMOO [JP]) [A] 1-4* columns 1,2,6,7; figures 2-6 *; | [I]JP2003195265 (KAWAGUCHIKO SEIMITSU KK) [I] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [IA]JP2003315793 (OPTREX KK) [I] 3,4 * the whole document * [A] 1,2 | International search | [Y]JPH0519254 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2002093233 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2003195265 (KAWAGUCHIKO SEIMITSU KK) | by applicant | JPH09243828 | WO2004055430 | JP2006205920 |