EP2055434 - DRIVER WITH TAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takahashi, Atsushi 20-15-1, Kizaki Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-0814 / JP | [2014/18] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Takahashi, Atsushi 20-15-1, Kizaki Tsuruga-shi Fukui 914-0814 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2014/18] | Blasberg, Tilo, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Blasberg, Tilo, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Blasberg, Tilo, et al 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 D-60325 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07791515.5 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP64821 | Priority number, date | JP20060208053 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006208053 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008015985 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055434 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055434 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/00, B25B23/142, A61C1/18, A61C8/00, B25B13/48, B25B23/00 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B25B23/1422 (EP,US);
A61C8/00 (KR);
A61C1/00 (EP,US);
A61C19/00 (KR);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US);
B25B13/46 (KR);
B25B13/481 (EP,US);
B25B23/0021 (EP,US);
B25B23/142 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | B25B15/00, A61C8/00, B25B23/16, B25B13/48, B25B23/00, A61C5/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/19] | B25B15/00, A61C8/00, B25B23/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRAUBENDREHER MIT SCHWANZ | [2009/19] | English: | DRIVER WITH TAIL | [2009/19] | French: | PILOTE AVEC QUEUE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2009 | Translation filed | 02.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2007 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | IT | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | NL | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | IE | 27.07.2014 | LU | 27.07.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GB | 30.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 27.07.2007 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
IE | 27.07.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GB | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
IT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
LU | 27.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
NL | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE20210696U (CARL DILLENIUS METALLWAREN GMB [DE]) [X] 1-2 * abstract * [A] 8 [Y] 3 [I] 4-6; | [XYI]FR2555890 (JOURDAN PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-2 * the whole document * [Y] 3 [I] 4-6; | [X]US4321040 (MILLER ALAN, et al) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE2502928 (ZDARSKY EDUARD) [X] 1 * page 2, line 18 - line 26; figure 1 * * page 5, line 9 - line 12 *; | [A]DE4200364 (VELTMAAT [DE]) [A] 7 * column 3, line 3 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [A]US4876929 (KOZAK BURTON [US]) [A] 8 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2001277144 (SHINKI SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]JPH1199484 (DAISEI GIKEN KK, et al); | [A]JPS59105377U ; | [A]JPH0733570U ; | [A]JPS5893465U ; | [A]JPS4022640B | by applicant | DE20210696U | FR2555890 | DE4200364 | US4876929 |