EP2055671 - METAL PHOSPHATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIBINO, Takashi 206-2, Kitawaki-cho Seto-shi, Aichi4890918 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Toshihiko 1881-91, Ami, Ami-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 3000331 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Takeshi 2-18-16, Aoyamadai Abiko-shi, Chiba 2701175 / JP | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Duckworth, Timothy John J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07791797.9 | 26.07.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP65117 | Priority number, date | JP20060205874 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006205874 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013317 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055671 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/42, H01B1/06, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
C01B25/42 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (EP,US);
H01M8/10 (KR);
H01M8/1016 (EP,US);
H01M8/124 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | METALLPHOSPHAT | [2009/19] | English: | METAL PHOSPHATE | [2009/19] | French: | PHOSPHATE MÉTALLIQUE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | Translation filed | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - M. NAGAO ET.AL., "Proton Conduction in In3+ - Doped SnP2O7 at Intermediate Temperatures", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20060615), vol. 153, no. 8, pages A1604 - A1609, XP002604637 [I] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2006054170 (CENTRAL RES INST ELECT); | [Y]JP2006164644 (TECHNO RASHI KOGYO KK); | [X] - NAGAO M. ET AL., "MP2O7-kei Kotai Denkaishitsu no Proton Dendensei to Sono Oyo", ELECTROCHEMISTRY, (20050905), vol. 73, no. 9, pages 846 - 850, XP003015498 | [A] - SHIBATA H. ET AL., "In3+ Dope SnP2O7 o Denkaishitsu ni Mochiita Chuon Sadogata Nenryo Denchi no Cathode Tokusei", DENKI KAGAKU DAI 73 KAI TAIKAI KOEN YOSHISHU, THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (20060401), page 376, XP003020720 | by applicant | JP2005294245 | - ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID STATE LETTERS, (2006), vol. 9, pages A105 - A109 |