EP2053069 - HYDROPHILIC GRAFT POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 4-1-1 Koraibashi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 4-1-1 Koraibashi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUMORI, Takahiro 6-28-206, Koyoen-higashiyamacho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0012 / JP | 02 /
WAKAO, Norihiro 3-1-9-5A, Uchihonmachi Suita-shi Osaka 564-0032 / JP | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792123.7 | 07.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007JP65454 | Priority number, date | JP20060221267 | 14.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006221267 | [2009/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020556 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053069 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053069 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/19 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C08F6/006 (EP,US);
C11D3/3788 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M15/27 (EP,US);
D06M15/53 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F283/06, C08F220/06 (US,EP);
C08F283/06, C08F220/08 (US,EP);
C08F6/006, C08L51/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | C08F283/06, C08F6/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/18] | C08F283/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | HYDROPHILES PFROPFPOLYMER | [2009/18] | English: | HYDROPHILIC GRAFT POLYMER | [2009/18] | French: | POLYMÈRE GREFFÉ HYDROPHILE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2009 | Translation filed | 04.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2007 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | IE | 07.08.2013 | LU | 07.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
IE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS5571710 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]JPH01103644 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [A]JPH03177406 (ROHM & HAAS); | [Y]JPH0753993 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [Y]JPH11279220 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2000026510 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [Y]JP2001226441 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | by applicant | US4528334 | US4612352 | EP0639592 | US5952432 | JPH11279220 | JP2001226441 | JP2006221267 |