EP2050817 - NUCLEIC ACID STRAND USEFUL IN DETECTING SUBSTANCE AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Kazuhiro SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Kazuhiro SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792487.6 | 14.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007JP65844 | Priority number, date | JP20060221228 | 14.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006221228 | JP20070203079 | 03.08.2007 Original published format: JP 2007203079 | [2009/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020589 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050817 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2050817 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, G01N21/78 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6804 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6823 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2521/301 (KR);
C12Q2525/119 (KR);
C12Q2565/101 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2565/1015, C12Q2525/119 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6823, C12Q2565/1015, C12Q2525/119, C12Q2565/101 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/17] | C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12Q1/68, G01N21/78 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/41] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUM NACHWEIS EINER SUBSTANZ GEEIGNETER NUKLEINSÄURESTRANG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/47] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID STRAND USEFUL IN DETECTING SUBSTANCE AND METHOD THEREOF | [2009/17] | French: | BRIN D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE UTILE POUR DETECTER UNE SUBSTANCE ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION CORRESPONDANT | [2009/41] |
Former [2009/17] | BEIM NACHWEIS EINER SUBSTANZ GEEIGNETER NUKLEINSÄURESTRANG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2009/17] | BRIN D'ACIDE NUCLÉIQUE UTILE POUR DÉTECTER UNE SUBSTANCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | Translation filed | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 17.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9804738 (WINGER EDWARD E [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * page 5, lines 6-13,31-36; claims 1-7; table 1 * * page 17, lines 31-36 * [Y] 2,6-8; | [XI]WO0011446 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 4; claims 1-3 * [I] 5; | [XYI]US2004101893 (KUTYAVIN IGOR V [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,4 * [Y] 2 [I] 6,7; | [XY] - ADLER M ET AL, "A real-time immuno-PCR assay for routine ultrasensitive quantification of proteins", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01364-0, (20030822), vol. 308, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 240 - 250, XP004442967 [X] 1,3,4 * figure 1 * [Y] 6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01364-0 | [XI] - TOMBELLI S ET AL, "Analytical applications of aptamers", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.BIOS.2004.11.006, (20050615), vol. 20, no. 12, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 2424 - 2434, XP004861158 [X] 1,4 * page 2427, column 2, paragraph 3; figure 3 * [I] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2004.11.006 | International search | [X]JP2005192418 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY, et al); | [Y]JPH02503515 ; | [Y]JPH06153997 (CANON KK) | [X] - CAIRNS M.J. ET AL., "Homogeneous real-time detection and quantification of nucleic acid amplification using restriction enzyme digestion", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2004), vol. 318, no. 3, pages 684 - 690, XP004508488 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2004.04.077 | by applicant | JP2004065262 | JP2005207823 | - TOMBELLI S. ET AL., BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (2005), vol. 20, pages 2424 - 2434 |