EP2080883 - HYBRID VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Aichi-ken Toyota-shi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Ikuo TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792933.9 | 23.08.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007JP66355 | Priority number, date | JP20060290278 | 25.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006290278 | [2009/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008050530 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080883 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02D29/02, B60K6/445, B60K6/448, B60L11/14, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, F01N3/20, F02D45/00, B60K6/22 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
B60K6/22 (US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/448 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/10 (EP,US);
B60W20/16 (EP);
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
F02D41/0235 (EP,US);
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
B60L2220/52 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/36 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/441 (EP,US);
B60L2240/443 (EP,US);
B60L2240/445 (EP,US);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60L2250/24 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/28 (EP,US);
B60W2510/068 (EP);
B60W2530/12 (US);
B60W2540/10 (EP);
B60W2710/0644 (EP);
B60W2710/0666 (EP);
B60W2710/0677 (EP);
B60W2710/081 (EP);
B60W2710/083 (EP);
F01N2560/025 (EP,US);
F01N2560/06 (EP,US);
F01N3/10 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0802 (EP,US);
F02D2200/501 (EP,US);
F02D2250/26 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0866 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | F02D29/02, B60K6/445, B60K6/448, B60L11/14, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, F01N3/20, F02D45/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/36] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HYBRIDFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DESSELBEN | [2009/30] | English: | HYBRID VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLING THE SAME | [2009/30] | French: | VÉHICULE HYBRIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2009 | Translation filed | 10.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH10288028 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,5-7,11-14 * abstract * [I] 3,4,9,10; | [XI]US2002063001 (LENNEVI JERKER [SE]) [X] 1,4-7,10-14 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0088]; figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0088] * [I] 3,9; | [XYI]US2003154952 (OSAWA KOICHI [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,11-14 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,8 [I] 3,4,9,10; | [A]US6624527 (CROMBEZ DALE SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [YA]US2005211489 (KOWATARI TAKEHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,8 * paragraph [0050]; figure 15 * [A] 1; | [I] - Valerie H Johnson ET AL, "HEV Control Strategy for Real-Time Optimization of Fuel Economy and Emissions", doi:10.4271/2000-01-1543, (20000402), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.37.753&rep=rep1&type=pdf, XP055459129 [I] 1,8,13,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4271/2000-01-1543 | International search | [A]JPH0939613 (AISIN AW CO); | [A]JP2002285878 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2004036626 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [A]JP2004197707 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [A]JP2006083776 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2002130001 |