EP2056617 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, RADIO TERMINAL, RADIO RELAY DEVICE, AND CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Tetsuro, c/o Panasonic, Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ARAMAKI, Takashi, c/o Panasonic, Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
EHARA, Hiroyuki, c/o Panasonic, Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21, OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07792948.7 | 24.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007JP66416 | Priority number, date | JP20060228348 | 24.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006228348 | JP20060294475 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006294475 | JP20070009331 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007009331 | [2009/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008023781 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056617 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04W80/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | 17.02.2009 | BA | 17.02.2009 | HR | 17.02.2009 | MK | 17.02.2009 | RS | 17.02.2009 | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, FUNKENDGERÄT, FUNKRELAYEINRICHTUNG UND STEUEREINRICHTUNG | [2009/19] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, RADIO TERMINAL, RADIO RELAY DEVICE, AND CONTROL DEVICE | [2009/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION, TERMINAL RADIO, DISPOSITIF DE RELAIS RADIO, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2009 | Translation filed | 17.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006211614 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2004007457 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2006157454 (SHARP KK); | [AE]JP2007235827 (NEC CORP) | by applicant | JP2003241799 | - TAKESHI MORI ET AL., "Wideband Speech Coding Robust against Packet Loss", INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS, (2005), vol. J88-DII, no. 7, pages 1103 - 1113 |