EP2047184 - AIR CONDITIONER AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 105-875 / KR | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUH, Deok LG ELECTRONICS INC.IP GROUP 327-23 Gasandong, Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Gil-Bong 602 Gohoong Bldg., 738-10 Bongcheon 7-dong, Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-057 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Won-Hee 105-1004 Kukdong Apt., Hyeonjeo-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-796 / KR | [2009/27] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
HUH, Deok 1817-1006, Bandal Maeul Apt., Sang 1-dong, Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 420-751 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Gil-Bong 602 Gohoong Bldg., 738-10 Bongcheon 7-dong, Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-057 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Won-Hee 105-1004 Kukdong Apt., Hyeonjeo-dong, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 120-796 / KR | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Josef Heinrich Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Schmidt, Josef Heinrich Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07793374.5 | 02.08.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007KR03719 | Priority number, date | KR20060073434 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060073434 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008016265 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047184 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F25B13/00, F25B47/02 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
F25B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
F25B1/00 (KR);
F25B43/00 (KR);
F25B47/02 (KR);
F25B47/022 (EP,US);
F25B2313/02741 (EP,US);
F25B2400/075 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | F25B13/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/37] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/16] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER AND CONTROLLING METHOD THEREOF | [2009/16] | French: | CLIMATISEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 04.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH11230646 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 4,8,9 [I] 7; | [Y]KR20040045227 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [Y] 4,9 * abstract *; | [YA]KR19990084377 (N.N.) [Y] 8 * figure 2 * [A] 3; | [X]JPS58119163U (N.N.) [X] 1,3,10-13 * figure 3 * | International search | [X]JPS58119163U ; | [Y]KR19990084377 ; | [X]KR20040045227 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) |