EP2052332 - XDM SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING XML DOCUMENT MANAGEMENT FUNCTION BY USING POSITION DESCRIPTION OF XML DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2019/40] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Jae-Kwon 205, Ivy Sweet 5-20, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-886 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Wuk 702-207, Jugong Apt. Byeoryang-dong Gwacheon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-708 / KR | [2019/40] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
OH, Jae-Kwon 205, Ivy Sweet 5-20, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-886 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Wuk 702-207, Jugong Apt. Byeoryang-dong Gwacheon-si Gyeonggi-do 427-708 / KR | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/31] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07793521.1 | 16.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007KR03917 | Priority number, date | KR20060077036 | 16.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060077036 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008020717 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052332 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052332 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/93, H04L29/08 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
G06F16/93 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,US);
G06F16/83 (EP,US);
G06F17/40 (KR);
H04B1/38 (KR);
H04B1/40 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | G06F17/30, H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2009/18] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/40] |
Former [2009/38] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | XDM-SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN VON XML-DOKUMENTVERWALTUNGSFUNKTION DURCH VERWENDUNG EINER POSITIONSBESCHREIBUNG EINES XML-DOKUMENTS | [2009/18] | English: | XDM SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING XML DOCUMENT MANAGEMENT FUNCTION BY USING POSITION DESCRIPTION OF XML DOCUMENT | [2009/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ XDM POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE D'UNE FONCTION DE GESTION DE DOCUMENT XML AU MOYEN D'UNE DESCRIPTION DE POSITION DE DOCUMENT XML | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 17.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE, "XML Document Management (XDM) Specification", no. CANDIDATE VERSION 1.0, (20060110), pages 1 - 52, OMA - OPEN MOBILE ALLIANCE,, URL: http://www.openmobilealliance.org/Technical/release_program/docs/XDM/V1_, (20090113), XP002510122 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - E. Nebel & L. Masinter, "Form-based File Upload in HTML", (19951101), The Internet Engineering Task Force (IETF), URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/rfc1867, (20111021), XP002661855 [Y] 1-15 * page 8 * | International search | [Y]US2003236903 (PIOTROWSKI DANIEL J [US]); | [A]KR20040001010 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]KR20050060803 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [Y]KR20060070415 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) | Examination | - Rosenberg, "The Extensible Markup Language (XML) Configuration Access Protocol (XCAP)", (20050711), URL: https://www.ietf.org/proceedings/63/IDs/draft-ietf-simple-xcap-07.txt, (20170712), XP055390287 | - DIVISION OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY, "Windows - DOS Commands", INTERNET CITATION, (2005), URL: http://kb.wisc.edu/helpdesk/page.php?id=903#ping, (20070727), XP002444672 | by applicant | - XML DOCUMENT MANAGEMENT (XDM) SPECIFICATION, (20060110), vol. 1.0 | - E. NOBEL, Form-based File Upload in HTMC, XEROX CORPORATION RFC, (199511), page 1867 |